US HB586 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 81-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fix the Immigration Loopholes Act This bill modifies immigration law provisions relating to unaccompanied alien minors and to asylum seekers. For certain unaccompanied inadmissible alien children, generally those not at risk of being trafficking victims nor having a fear of persecution, the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall repatriate the child. Currently, only inadmissible unaccompanied aliens from neighboring countries are subject to repatriation, and DHS has discretion whether to repatriate. When HHS releases an unaccompanied child to an individual, it shall provide DHS with certain information about that individual, including Social Security number and immigration status. The bill amends the definition of "credible fear of persecution" to require that such fear can be established by statements that are more probable than not. The bill also imposes certain rules relating to credible fear interviews, including requirements for recordings and interpreters. If an alien is granted asylum because of fear of persecution in a country, the alien is deemed to have renounced asylum status by returning to that country, if there has been no change in the country's conditions. DHS may waive such renunciation if there was a compelling reason for the return. The bill expands the definition of a frivolous asylum application to include an application so insufficient in substance that it is clear that it was filed to delay removal or seek employment authorization. Any individual who knowingly and willfully makes materially false statements or uses fraudulent documents in asylum-related proceedings shall be fined or imprisoned up to 10 years, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fix the Immigration Loopholes Act

Sponsors

Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]
Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]
Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB517 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB574 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3857 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3940 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3855 (Related) 2019-08-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback