US HB583 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

PIRATE Act Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PIRATE Act Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenateSigned by President.
2020-01-14SenatePresented to President.
2020-01-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-01-08SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S84)
2020-01-08SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-02-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2019-02-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2050)
2019-02-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 583.
2019-02-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2050-2052)
2019-02-25HouseMr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1228 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback