US HB5823 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a program to make grants to States to address cybersecurity risks and cybersecurity threats to information systems of State, local, Tribal, or territorial governments, and for other purposes.
Title
State and Local Cybersecurity Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5080-5083) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5823. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5080-5084) |
2020-09-30 | House | Ms. Underwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-08-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384. |
2020-08-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-478. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8048 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Employee hiring
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Employee hiring
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations