US HB5811 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises personnel policies of the Transportation Security Administration (TSA). Specifically, the TSA must ensure that its personnel (1) have adequate access to facilities designated for use by nursing mothers in the workplace, and (2) are provided at least 12 weeks of paid parental leave.
Title
TSA Personnel Workplace Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5085-5086) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5811. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5085-5086) |
2020-09-30 | House | Ms. Underwood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Department of Homeland Security
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Labor standards
Transportation and public works
Women's employment
Women's rights
Worker safety and health
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Labor standards
Transportation and public works
Women's employment
Women's rights
Worker safety and health