US HB5808 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title II of the Social Security Act to make available parental leave benefits to parents following the birth or adoption of a child, and for other purposes.
Title
New Parents Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2021-11-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-11-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2764 (Related) 2021-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8851 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB4868 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5808/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5808/BILLS-117hr5808ih.pdf |