US HB5807 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SUD CARE Act Substance Use Disorder Coordination, Access, Recovery Enhancement Act of 2018
Title
SUD CARE Act Substance Use Disorder Coordination, Access, Recovery Enhancement Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5795 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
HB6082 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6082 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Housing discrimination
Medical education
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Health
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Housing discrimination
Medical education
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5807/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5807/BILLS-115hr5807ih.pdf |