US HB578 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military Residency Choice Act This bill amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to permit the spouse of a servicemember to elect to use the same residence as the servicemember for purposes of taxation and voting, regardless of the date on which the marriage of the spouse and the servicemember occurred.
Title
Military Residency Choice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB282 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2541 (Related) 2018-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2541 (Related) 2018-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Marriage and family status
Military personnel and dependents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Marriage and family status
Military personnel and dependents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/578/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr578/BILLS-115hr578ih.pdf |