US HB5777 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COG Act of 2018 Centralized Opioid Guidance Act of 2018 This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to publish and periodically update all guidance issued since January 1, 2016, related to the prescription of opioids for Medicare beneficiaries.
Title
COG Act of 2018 Centralized Opioid Guidance Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5774 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5777/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5777/BILLS-115hr5777ih.pdf |