US HB5763 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 117-52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 117-52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To provide an extension of Federal-aid highway, highway safety, and transit programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Further Surface Transportation Extension Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 358 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-31 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-52. |
2021-10-31 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-10-29 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-10-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-10-28 | House | UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Cicilline asked unanimous consent that in the engrossment of H.R. 5763, the Clerk be directed to make the following correction: On page 3, line 17, insert "of this section" after "(c)". |
2021-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 358 - 59 (Roll no. 339). (text: CR H5962-5963) |
2021-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5763. |
2021-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5962-5965) |
2021-10-28 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | See also S. 3122. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed, pursuant to the order of October 28, 2021, without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7455) |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Science, Space, and Technology, Energy and Commerce, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3122 (Related) 2021-10-28 - See also H.R. 5763.
HB5763 (Similar To) 2021-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 117-52.
HB5763 (Similar To) 2021-10-31 - Became Public Law No: 117-52.