US HB5762 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Task Force to Combat Opioid Trafficking Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a joint task force to enhance DHS border security operations to detect, interdict, disrupt, and prevent narcotics, such as fentanyl and other synthetic opioids, from entering the United States. The task force may coordinate with: (1) the private sector, which may include a two-year assignment of a private sector employee to a task force; and (2) other federal, state, local, tribal, territorial, or international task forces and entities. (Sec. 3) DHS shall determine whether to establish the task force and notify Congress of its determination within 90 days.
Title
Joint Task Force to Combat Opioid Trafficking Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-06-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5267-5268) |
2018-06-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5762. |
2018-06-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5267-5269) |
2018-06-19 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 588. |
2018-06-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-755. |
2018-06-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2018-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2864 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Intergovernmental relations
Public-private cooperation