US HB5759 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century IDEA 21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act
Title
21st Century IDEA 21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-336. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7453) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9720-9721) |
2018-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5759. |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9720-9722) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-11-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 821. |
2018-11-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-1055. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3050 (Related) 2018-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 723.