US HB5754 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the ability of veterans to electronically submit complaints about the delivery of health care services by the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Patient Advocate Tracker Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 411 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-175. |
2022-09-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-09-15 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4519-4520) |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 202). (text: 05/16/2022 CR H4997) |
2022-05-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5082-5083) |
2022-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5754. |
2022-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4997) |
2022-05-16 | House | Mr. Trone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Technology Modernization Discharged. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2022-03-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology Modernization. |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-10-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3304 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.