US HB575 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Mullin. Petition No: 117-15. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Mullin. Petition No: 117-15. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a more uniform, transparent, and modern process to authorize the construction, connection, operation, and maintenance of international border-crossing facilities for the import and export of oil and natural gas and the transmission of electricity.
Title
Promoting Cross-border Energy Infrastructure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | House | Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Mullin. Petition No: 117-15. (Discharge petition text with signatures.) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/575/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr575/BILLS-117hr575ih.pdf |