US HB574 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Equal Protection of Unaccompanied Minors Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Protection of Unaccompanied Minors Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB98 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB517 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB586 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB1106 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB599 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1928 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Assault and harassment offenses
Chemical and biological weapons
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family relationships
Federal appellate courts
Firearms and explosives
Fires
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government liability
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
International law and treaties
Judges
Judicial review and appeals
Jurisdiction and venue
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Motor vehicles
Nuclear weapons
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation safety and security
Violent crime
Visas and passports

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback