US HB5735 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows states, tribes, territories, and localities to use certain COVID-19 relief funds for new categories of spending, including for natural disasters and infrastructure projects. It also makes changes to expenditure deadlines and other aspects of this funding. Specifically, recipients may use funds for emergency relief from natural disasters and associated negative economic impacts of natural disasters. In addition, recipients may use a portion of their COVID-19 relief funds for designated infrastructure projects, such as nationally significant freight and highway projects. Furthermore, the bill allows recipients to expend COVID-19 relief funds on these types of infrastructure projects until September 30, 2026. Under current law, recipients must expend the funds by December 31, 2024. Other changes in the bill include (1) modifying eligibility and allocation requirements for funding set aside for counties and Indian tribes that are near public lands, (2) allowing Indian tribes an additional year to expend their COVID-19 relief funds, and (3) establishing a process for government entities to decline COVID-19 relief funds and requiring any declined funds to be used to reduce the federal deficit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State, Local, Tribal, and Territorial Fiscal Recovery, Infrastructure, and Disaster Relief Flexibility Act

Sponsors

Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]
Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]
Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM]
Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2021-10-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3011 (Same As) 2021-10-20 - Held at the desk.

Subjects

Air quality
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Endangered and threatened species
Federal-Indian relations
Fishes
Forests, forestry, trees
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health programs administration and funding
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Land use and conservation
Minority health
Motor vehicles
Natural disasters
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public transit
Puerto Rico
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wages and earnings

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback