US HB5726 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Non-Federal Reservoir Operations Improvement Act This bill authorizes the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to receive and expend funds from an owner of a nonfederal reservoir to formulate, review, or revise reservoir operational documents. The reservoir must have been constructed at least in part with federal funds provided for the use of storage for flood risk management or navigation.
Title
Non-Federal Reservoir Operations Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3922-3924) |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-05-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E617-618) |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 488.
SB2563 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
SB2563 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5726/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5726/BILLS-115hr5726ih.pdf |