US HB5720 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to provide for a periodic transaction reporting requirement for Federal judicial officers and the online publication of financial disclosure reports of Federal judicial officers, and for other purposes.
Title
Courthouse Ethics and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 422 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 422 - 4 (Roll No. 392). |
2021-12-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2021-12-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-12-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5720. |
2021-12-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2021-12-01 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-12-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143. |
2021-12-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-199. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3059 (Same As) 2022-05-13 - Became Public Law No: 117-125.