US HB570 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 403.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require operators of offshore oil and gas facilities to report failures of critical systems to the Secretary of the Interior, and for other purposes.
Title
Offshore Accountability Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 403. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-562. |
2021-10-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 19. |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2021-05-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |