US HB5694 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce the threshold for mandatory minimum penalties for fentanyl-related offenses under the Controlled Substances Act and the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Fentanyl Penalties Parity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] | Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Mary Miller [R-IL] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1293 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5694/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5694/BILLS-117hr5694ih.pdf |