US HB5693 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Long-Term Care Veterans Choice Act This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), during the three-year period beginning on October 1, 2019, to transfer upon request a veteran for whom the VA is required to provide nursing home care to a medical foster home that meets VA standards. A veteran shall agree, as a transfer condition, to accept VA home health services.
Title
Long-Term Care Veterans Choice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7172-7173) |
2018-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5693. |
2018-07-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7172-7175) |
2018-07-25 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 671. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-868. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |