US HB5676 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to establish an Office of Prison Education, and for other purposes.
Title
PREP Act Promoting Reentry through Education in Prisons Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3060 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5676/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5676/BILLS-117hr5676ih.pdf |