US HB5663 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Safeguarding Therapeutics Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safeguarding Therapeutics Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2020-09-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4635)
2020-09-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5663.
2020-09-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4635-4636)
2020-09-21HouseMrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-09-17HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 412.
2020-09-17HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-512.
2020-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2020-01-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4225 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback