US HB5655 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-406.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument Act This bill establishes, as a unit of the National Park System, the Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument in Nicholasville, Kentucky, in order to preserve, protect, and interpret the nationally significant historic resources of Camp Nelson and its role in the Civil War, Reconstruction, and African-American history and civil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Camp Nelson Heritage National Monument Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 233 (Y: 376 N: 4 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-406.
2018-11-29SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 693.
2018-11-29SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-08-15SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2018-06-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-06-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-06-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 4 (Roll no. 233). (text: CR H4753)
2018-06-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4760-4761)
2018-06-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-06-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5655.
2018-06-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4753-4754)
2018-06-05HouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-05-21HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 538.
2018-05-21HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-695.
2018-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-04-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2018-04-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3287 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback