US HB5641 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to increase the threshold for eligibility for assistance under sections 403, 406, 407, and 502 of such Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Small Project Efficient and Effective Disaster Recovery Act SPEED Recovery Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 414 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the reported bill. |
2022-10-10 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-189. |
2022-10-10 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-10-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to section 10 of H. Res. 1396, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1638, as amended; H.R. 3304, as amended; H.R. 4081, as amended; H.R. 4821, as amended; H.R. 6889, as amended; H.R. 6967, as amended; H.R. 8163, as amended; H.R. 8510, as amended; H.R. 8681, as amended; H.R. 8875, as amended; H.R. 8956; S. 1198; and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 5641. |
2022-09-29 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1396, proceedings on H.R. 5641 are considered vacated. |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. (text: CR H8168) |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendments to H.R. 5641. |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Carson moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H8167-8168) |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4876-4877; text: CR S4877) |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 483. |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper for Senator Peters with amendments. With written report No. 117-145. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 11 (Roll no. 114). (text: CR H4175) |
2022-04-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4183) |
2022-04-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5641. |
2022-04-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4175-4177) |
2022-04-05 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 201. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-274. |
2021-10-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-10-20 | House | Introduced in House |