US HB564 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-20 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-20 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide paid family and medical leave to Federal employees, and for other purposes.
Title
Comprehensive Paid Leave for Federal Employees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 16. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/564/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr564/BILLS-117hr564ih.pdf |