US HB5631 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reform and enhance the pay and benefits of Federal wildland firefighters, and for other purposes.
Title
Tim Hart Wildland Firefighter Classification and Pay Parity Act Tim’s Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-10-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5631/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5631/BILLS-117hr5631ih.pdf |