US HB5619 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish two grant programs to prevent self-harm and suicide. First, HHS must award grants to state, local, and tribal health departments to expand surveillance of self-harm. In awarding these grants, HHS must prioritize recipients in areas that experience rates of nonfatal suicidal behavior that are above the national average and must take into account other factors such as the unique needs of rural communities. As a condition of receiving this funding, recipients must agree to share data on suicide and self-harm with the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Second, HHS must award grants to hospital emergency departments for programs to prevent suicide attempts among patients after discharge, including programs for screening patients for self-harm and suicide and providing short-term preventive services, as appropriate. In addition, HHS must develop standards of practice for such screenings.
Title
Suicide Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4633-4634) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5619. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4633-4635) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 420. |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-520. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3198 (Same As) 2020-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S247)
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding