US HB561 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 186-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs .
Pending: House Indian and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs .
Pending: House Indian and Insular Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure affordable abortion coverage and care for every person, and for other purposes.
Title
EACH Act of 2023 Equal Access to Abortion Coverage in Health Insurance Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs . |
2023-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Natural Resources, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, the Judiciary, Oversight and Accountability, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1031 (Related) 2023-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/561/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr561/BILLS-118hr561ih.pdf |