US HB5602 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 180-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Domestic Terrorism Prevention Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Terrorism Prevention Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 2.
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
2020-01-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3190 (Related) 2020-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S195-197)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback