US HB5602 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 180-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new requirements to expand the availability of information on domestic terrorism, as well as the relationship between domestic terrorism and hate crimes. It authorizes domestic terrorism components within the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), the Department of Justice (DOJ), and the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to monitor, analyze, investigate, and prosecute domestic terrorism. The domestic terrorism components of DHS, DOJ, and the FBI must jointly report on domestic terrorism, including white-supremacist-related incidents or attempted incidents. DHS, DOJ, and the FBI must review the anti-terrorism training and resource programs of their agencies that are provided to federal, state, local, and tribal law enforcement agencies. It creates an interagency task force to analyze and combat white supremacist and neo-Nazi infiltration of the uniformed services and federal law enforcement agencies. Finally, it directs the FBI to assign a special agent or hate crimes liaison to each field office to investigate hate crimes incidents with a nexus to domestic terrorism.
Title
Domestic Terrorism Prevention Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4583-4586) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5602. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4583-4589) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 426. |
2020-09-21 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2020-09-21 | House | Committee on Homeland Security discharged. |
2020-09-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-526, Part I. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 2. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3190 (Related) 2020-01-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S195-197)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Hate crimes
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Racial and ethnic relations
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Hate crimes
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Racial and ethnic relations
Terrorism