US HB5591 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to expand the eligibility of students to participate in the supplemental nutrition assistance program, establish college student food insecurity demonstration programs, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Food Security Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
2021-10-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2021-10-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3100 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
SB1569 (Related) 2021-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback