US HB5589 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pyrolysis Innovation Grants Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pyrolysis Innovation Grants Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-01HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
2021-11-01HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-167.
2021-10-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-10-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-10-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2021-10-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4763 (Related) 2021-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback