US HB5586 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to undertake specific initiatives to prioritize and assess (1) the protection and preservation of human rights in Haiti, (2) the promotion of press and assembly freedoms and the protection of journalists in Haiti, (3) efforts to combat corruption in Haiti, and (4) a strategy of post-disaster recovery and development efforts in Haiti.
Title
Haiti Development, Accountability, and Institutional Transparency Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5897-5898) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5586. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5897-5900) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere, Civilian Security and Trade. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Haiti
Human rights
International affairs
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Reconstruction and stabilization
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Haiti
Human rights
International affairs
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Reconstruction and stabilization
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela