US HB5577 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Innovation in Offshore Leasing Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to authorize the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management (BOEM) to conduct offshore oil and gas lease sales through Internet-based bidding methods. Before conducting any Internet-based sale, BOEM is required to gather information from each company present for bidding at the 10 most recent oil and gas lease sales conducted under the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act. The information is designed to provide the bidding public sufficient opportunity to share ideas, methods, and concerns regarding Internet-based leasing. All Internet-based sales must meet certain requirements and BOEM shall publicly disclose statistical data regarding any sale on the day the sale is executed. Additionally, BOEM must conduct at least one Internet-based lease sale in the Gulf of Mexico Outer Continental Shelf Region within 18 months. BOEM must also provide a report to Congress within 90 days after it conducts a third Internet-based lease sale.
Title
Innovation in Offshore Leasing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-09-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5069-5070) |
2016-09-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5577. |
2016-09-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5069-5070) |
2016-09-06 | House | Mr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 552. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-713. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2016-07-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2016-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Energy
Government information and archives
Gulf of Mexico
Internet and video services
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Energy
Government information and archives
Gulf of Mexico
Internet and video services
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas