US HB5575 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to increase the rate of pay for certain nurses and other medical positions of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Nurse and Physician Assistant RAISE Act Department of Veterans Affairs Nurse and Physician Assistant Retention and Income Security Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10. |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3820 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5575/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5575/BILLS-117hr5575ih.pdf |