US HB5564 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for certain requirements with respect to ownership and diversity reporting for television broadcast stations and cable operators, and for other purposes.
Title
Enhancing Broadcaster DIVERSITY Data Act Enhancing Broadcaster Diversity and Inclusion by Verifying and Ensuring the Reporting required by Statute Is Transpiring and Yielding Data Act
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Minority employment
Racial and ethnic relations
Science, technology, communications
Women in business
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Minority employment
Racial and ethnic relations
Science, technology, communications
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5564/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5564/BILLS-116hr5564ih.pdf |