US HB5549 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to authorize advance appropriations for the Indian Health Service by providing 2-fiscal-year budget authority, and for other purposes.
Title
Indian Health Service Advance Appropriations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-10-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5549/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5549/BILLS-117hr5549ih.pdf |