US HB5547 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Star Print ordered on on the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Public Works and Economic Development Act of 1965 to require eligible recipients of certain grants to develop a comprehensive economic development strategy that directly or indirectly increases the accessibility of affordable, quality care-based services, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CEDS Act Care is an Economic Development Strategy Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 304 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-13SenateStar Print ordered on on the bill.
2022-03-31SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2022-03-30HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-03-30HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 304 - 122 (Roll no. 94). (text: CR H3990-3991)
2022-03-30HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3998-3999)
2022-03-30HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-03-30HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5547.
2022-03-30HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3990-3992)
2022-03-30HouseMs. Williams (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2022-03-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 189.
2022-03-08HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
2022-03-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-259, Part I.
2021-10-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 4.
2021-10-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-10-27HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
2021-10-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2021-10-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-10-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback