US HB5543 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-13)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase the number of Vet Centers in certain States based on population metrics, and for other purposes.
Title
Vet CENTERS for Mental Health Act of 2021 Veterans Census-Enabled National Treatment Equitable Resource Supplement for Mental Health Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3255 (Related) 2021-11-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5543/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5543/BILLS-117hr5543ih.pdf |