US HB5532 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reconstruction Era National Historical Park Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reconstruction Era National Historical Park Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2018-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8140-8141)
2018-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5532.
2018-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8140-8142)
2018-09-12HouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-07HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 720.
2018-09-07HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-927.
2018-07-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-18HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-07-17HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2018-04-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2018-04-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2018-04-17HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback