US HB5529 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make certain improvements to the Veterans Justice Outreach Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Justice Outreach Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-04 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3323 (Related) 2021-12-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5529/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5529/BILLS-117hr5529ih.pdf |