US HB5524 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure the digital contents of electronic equipment and online accounts belonging to or in the possession of United States persons entering or exiting the United States are adequately protected at the border, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Data at the Border Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-10-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2957 (Same As) 2021-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5524/BILLS-117hr5524ih.pdf |