US HB5504 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency, the Secretary of the Interior, and the Secretary of Agriculture to maintain the Urban Waters Federal Partnership Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Urban Waters Federal Partnership Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2285 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5504/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5504/BILLS-117hr5504ih.pdf |