US HB5502 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require online marketplaces to verify certain information regarding high-volume third party sellers of consumer products on such online marketplaces and to disclose to consumers certain contact and other information regarding such high-volume third party sellers.
Title
INFORM Consumers Act Integrity, Notification, and Fairness in Online Retail Marketplaces for Consumers Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-11-17 | House | Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 1464, and the motion offered by Mr. Carter (LA), the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 4275, as amended; H.R. 5502, as amended; H.R. 5721, as amended; H.R. 6290, as amended; H.R. 7277, as amended; H.R. 7299, as amended; and H.R. 8416, as amended. (consideration: CR H8566-8574; text: CR H8567-8568) |
2022-11-17 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, proceedings on H.R. 5502 are considered vacated. |
2022-11-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5502. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8477-8480; text: CR H8477-8478) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399. |
2022-11-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-555. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-16 | House | Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce Discharged. |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB936 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S1712-1713)
HR1464 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1464 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.