US HB55 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 181-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Became Public Law No: 117-107. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes lynching a federal hate crime offense. Specifically, the bill imposes criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to 30 years, or both—on an individual who conspires to commit a hate crime offense that results in death or serious bodily injury or that includes kidnapping or an attempt to kidnap, aggravated sexual abuse or an attempt to commit aggravated sexual abuse, or an attempt to kill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emmett Till Antilynching Act Emmett Till Antilynching Act

Sponsors

Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]
Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]

Roll Calls

2022-02-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 422 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-29HouseBecame Public Law No: 117-107. (TXT | PDF)
2022-03-29HouseSigned by President.
2022-03-28HousePresented to President.
2022-03-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2022-03-07SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1012-1013)
2022-03-01SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2022-02-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-02-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 3 (Roll no. 47). (text: CR H1166)
2022-02-28HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1172)
2022-02-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-02-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 55.
2022-02-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1166-1169)
2022-02-28HouseMr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2022-02-25HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 181.
2022-02-25HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-251.
2021-12-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-12-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-12-08HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
2021-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-01-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3710 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback