US HB549 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Venezuela TPS Act of 2019 This bill addresses the migration of Venezuelan nationals by permitting them to qualify for temporary protected status, which prevents their removal from the United States and allows them to obtain employment and travel authorization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Venezuela TPS Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-25 - House - On passage RC# 514 (Y: 272 N: 158 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-25 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 513 (Y: 215 N: 217 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 498 (Y: 268 N: 154 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-07-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-25HouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 272 - 158 (Roll no. 514). (text: CR H7409)
2019-07-25HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 215 - 217 (Roll no. 513).
2019-07-25HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2019-07-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Reschenthaler motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to insert new language on Page 1, line 11: "because of the economic, humanitarian, security and refugee crisis that is a direct result of years of socialist policies implemented by the regimes of Hugo Chavez and Nicolas Maduro".
2019-07-25HouseMr. Reschenthaler moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H7440-7441)
2019-07-25HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7440-7443)
2019-07-25HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule 19, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 549.
2019-07-25HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-07-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 30 minutes of debate on H.R. 549.
2019-07-25HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549 under closed rules. Resolution also waives clause 6(a) of Rule XIII, requiring a two-thirds vote waiver to consider a rule on the same day it is reported from the Rules Committee against any resolution reported through the legislative day of July 26, 2019.
2019-07-25HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 519. (consideration: CR H7409-7412)
2019-07-25HouseRule H. Res. 519 passed House.
2019-07-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 519 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549 under closed rules. Resolution also waives clause 6(a) of Rule XIII, requiring a two-thirds vote waiver to consider a rule on the same day it is reported from the Rules Committee against any resolution reported through the legislative day of July 26, 2019.
2019-07-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 268 - 154 (Roll no. 498).
2019-07-23HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7222-7223)
2019-07-23HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-07-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 549.
2019-07-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7211-7215; text: CR H7211)
2019-07-23HouseMs. Mucarsel-Powell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-23HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 128.
2019-07-23HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-168.
2019-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 9.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR519 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2783 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB636 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback