US HB5487 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes grants and establishes other programs to improve data collection on stillbirths. Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) may award grants for surveillance and data collection on stillbirths, and HHS must issue guidelines for health departments and vital statistics units concerning the collection of stillbirth data. HHS must also develop educational awareness materials about stillbirths and make them publicly available. Furthermore, HHS must implement a fellowship program to provide training in perinatal autopsy pathology and otherwise support research on stillbirths and fetal autopsies. The bill also requires HHS to issue a report with educational guidelines on stillbirths and stillbirth risk factors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SHINE for Autumn Act of 2021 Stillbirth Health Improvement and Education for Autumn Act of 2021 SHINE for Autumn Act of 2021 Stillbirth Health Improvement and Education for Autumn Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 408 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2021-12-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-12-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 18 (Roll no. 416). (text: CR H7514)
2021-12-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7536)
2021-12-08HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-12-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5487.
2021-12-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7514-7515)
2021-12-08HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-12-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 151.
2021-12-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-210.
2021-11-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-11-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-11-04HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2021-11-04HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-10-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-10-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-10-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3972 (Related) 2022-03-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback