US HB5469 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Propane Supply and Security Act of 2014 - Directs the Administrator of the Energy Information Administration (EIA) to publish weekly inventory data on propane storage and propane markets, including pricing data for residential customers in states that voluntarily choose to participate in the State Heating Oil and Propane Program (SHOPP) of the EIA. Directs the Administrator to publish data on storage at: (1) major market centers, and (2) the regions reported in specified weekly and monthly inventory data. Directs the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to lead and coordinate federal and state emergency response efforts regarding propane supply emergencies in any state or region characterized by either sudden increases in consumer prices for propane, or propane supply shortages that threaten public safety or livestock safety. Amends the Propane Education and Research Act of 1996 to direct the Propane Education and Research Council to develop for propane distributors and consumers training programs on strategies to mitigate negative effects of future propane price spikes. Directs the Secretary to study the effectiveness and feasibility of establishing propane storage facilities operated separately from the Strategic Petroleum Reserve. Authorizes the Secretary to submit to Congress and the President a plan describing such regional propane reserve. Amends the Food, Conservation, and Energy Act of 2008 to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to include within the storage facility loan program funding for propane storage and handling facilities used for drying and heating. Directs the Comptroller General (GAO) to study facilities appurtenant to propane pipelines that are not subject to the jurisdiction of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) to determine: (1) whether the nonjurisdictional nature of the facilities had an impact on the propane price spike during the winter of 2013-2014, or (2) whether such finding demonstrates it would be in the public interest to place such facilities under FERC jurisdiction.
Title
Propane Supply and Security Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2014-09-15 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2014-09-15 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-09-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2762 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Alternative and renewable resources
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy prices
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Lighting and heating
Livestock
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Alternative and renewable resources
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy prices
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Lighting and heating
Livestock
Oil and gas
Pipelines
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5469/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5469/BILLS-113hr5469ih.pdf |