US HB5468 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 558.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to allow for prepayment of repayment obligations under Repayment Contracts between the United States and the Weber Basin Water Conservancy District. This bill directs the Department of the Interior to permit the prepayment of repayment obligations under Repayment Contract No. 14-06-400-33 between the United States and the Weber Basin Water Conservancy District, including all related applicable contracts, providing for repayment of Weber Basin Project construction costs allocated to irrigation and municipal and industrial purposes under terms and conditions similar to those used in implementing the provisions in the Central Utah Project Completion Act for prepayment of Central Utah Project, Bonneville Unit repayment obligations. The prepayment: shall result in the United States recovering the net present value of all repayment streams that would have been payable to the United States if this bill was not in effect; may be provided in several installments; may not be adjusted on the basis of the type of prepayment financing used by the District; and shall result in total repayment by September 30, 2026.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to allow for prepayment of repayment obligations under Repayment Contracts between the United States and the Weber Basin Water Conservancy District.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 558. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-719. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2016-06-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2016-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-06-14 | House | Introduced in House |