US HB5458 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans TRICARE Choice Act of 2016 This bill allows, as of January 1, 2017, an individual who is eligible to be a covered beneficiary entitled to health care benefits under the TRICARE program (a Department of Defense [DOD] managed health care program) and who is not serving on active duty in the uniformed services to: (1) elect to be ineligible to enroll in TRICARE, (2) make tax deductible contributions to a health savings account during the period such individual elects to be ineligible for TRICARE coverage, and (3) enroll in the TRICARE program at a later date during a special enrollment period. DOD shall submit to the Internal Revenue Service information on each TRICARE-eligible individual who makes such election for purposes of determining such individual's eligibility for a health savings account. DOD shall provide to each TRICARE-eligible individual who seeks to make such election information regarding: (1) health savings accounts, and (2) changing an election.
Title
Veterans TRICARE Choice Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6317) |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5458. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6317-6319) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Smith (NE) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 633. |
2016-11-14 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-809, Part I. |
2016-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents